PA HB652 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-09 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-09 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 25, 1931 (P.L.1352, No.332), referred to as the Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Compact, providing for veto power by the Governor over certain actions; further providing for audits; and providing the Governor of each state with power to ratify or veto certain actions taken by commissioners.
Title
Amending the act of June 25, 1931 (P.L.1352, No.332), referred to as the Delaware River Joint Toll Bridge Compact, providing for veto power by the Governor over certain actions; further providing for audits; and providing the Governor of each state with power to ratify or veto certain actions taken by commissioners.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Emrick [R] | Sen. Rosemary Brown [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Mark Gillen [R] |
Rep. Rich Irvin [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. John Lawrence [R] | Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R] |
Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Brett Miller [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] |
Rep. Tina Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Floor: HB 652 PN 2868, FP (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Floor: HB 652 PN 2868, FP (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-09 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-10-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-10-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (184-0) |
2018-10-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-09-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-25 | House | Second consideration |
2018-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-25 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-25 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |