PA HB626 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-29 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-29 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, further providing for the procedure for claiming special tax provisions and for proof of eligibility.
Title
Further providing for the procedure for claiming special tax provisions and for proof of eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - HB 626 PN 3515, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - HB 626 PN 627, 2011 A1375, MUNDY (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - HB 626 PN 627, 2011 A10308, BEAR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - HB 626 PN 627, 2011 A1375, MUNDY (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - HB 626 PN 627, 2011 A10308, BEAR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2012-05-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-05-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2012-05-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-05-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-05-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-04 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-02-14 | House | Referred to FINANCE |