PA HB612 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-10 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-10 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the right to practice naturopathic medicine; providing for the issuance of licenses and the suspension and revocation of licenses; providing for penalties; and making repeals.
Title
Relating to the right to practice naturopathic medicine; providing for the issuance of licenses and the suspension and revocation of licenses; providing for penalties; and making repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-02 - House - HB 612 PN 1959, FP (Y: 161 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2013-10-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-10-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (161-33) |
2013-10-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-10-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-01 | House | Second consideration |
2013-09-30 | House | Removed from table |
2013-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-05 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-05 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |