PA HB609 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 23, 1945 (P.L.913, No.367), known as the Engineer, Land Surveyor and Geologist Registration Law, further providing for definitions, for procedure for licensing as professional engineer, for continuing professional competency requirements and for exemption from licensure and registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for procedure for licensing as professional engineer, for continuing professional competency requirements and for exemption from licensure and registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 609 PN 1281, FP (Y: 197 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A00719 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2021-05-04SenateIn the Senate
2021-05-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-4)
2021-05-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-21HouseSecond consideration
2021-04-20HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-19HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-19HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-19HouseReported as amended
2021-02-24HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=609
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0609&pn=0572
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0609&pn=1281
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0609P1281.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=04/19/2021&RollCallId=297
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=04/19/2021&RollCallId=298
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/03/2021&RollCallId=360
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=181

Bill Comments 750

feedback