PA HB605 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in arbitration, providing for compulsory arbitration of COVID-19 actions; and, in particular rights and immunities, providing for COVID-19-related liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In arbitration, providing for compulsory arbitration of COVID-19 actions; and, in particular rights and immunities, providing for COVID-19-related liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 605 PN 1142, FP (Y: 107 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 605 PN 1028, 2021 A598, ECKER (Y: 111 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-04-06SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (107-94)
2021-04-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-05HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-03-24HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-24HouseReported as committed
2021-03-23HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=605
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0605&pn=1028
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0605&pn=1142
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0605P1142.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=234
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=113
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=132
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/06/2021&RollCallId=267

Bill Comments 750

feedback