PA HB584 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-14 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-14 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in fishing licenses, further providing for exemptions from license requirements.
Title
In fishing licenses, further providing for exemptions from license requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 584 PN 591, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 584 PN 591, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2019-03-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2019-03-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-19 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |