PA HB580 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-28 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-28 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in depositions and witnesses, further providing for expert testimony in certain criminal proceedings.
Title
In depositions and witnesses, further providing for expert testimony in certain criminal proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 580 PN 543, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 580 PN 543, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-05-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2021-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2021-04-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-20 | House | First consideration |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |