PA HB568 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-26 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-26 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for Uniform Construction Code Review and Advisory Council and providing for review of updated sections and adoption of updated sections into Uniform Construction Code; in Uniform Construction Code, further providing for revised or successor codes; in adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement; in training and certification of inspectors, further providing for education and training programs; and, in exemptions, applicability and penalties, further providing for applicability to certain buildings.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for Uniform Construction Code Review and Advisory Council and providing for review of updated sections and adoption of updated sections into Uniform Construction Code; in Uniform Construction Code, further providing for revised or successor codes; in adoption and enforcement by municipalities, further providing for administration and enforcement; in training and certification of inspectors, further providing for education and training programs; and, in exemptions, applicability and penalties, further providing for applicability to certain buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 568 PN 3705, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 568 PN 3949, CONCUR (Y: 107 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 568 PN 3949, MOT RECOM LABOR, GALLOWAY (Y: 82 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 568 PN 3949, 2015 A10372, SUSP RULES, VITALI (Y: 72 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-09-27 - House - House Rules: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10331 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 568 PN 3705, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Floor: HB 568 PN 638, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 568 PN 3949, CONCUR (Y: 107 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 568 PN 3949, MOT RECOM LABOR, GALLOWAY (Y: 82 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 568 PN 3949, 2015 A10372, SUSP RULES, VITALI (Y: 72 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-09-27 - House - House Rules: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A10331 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 568 PN 3705, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Floor: HB 568 PN 638, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-26 | House | In the House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments, as amended by the Senate (47-0) |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended with Prior Printer's No. 3705 |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-09-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-09-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (107-86) |
2016-09-27 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2016-09-27 | House | Amended in House Committee on RULES |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-07-11 | House | In the House |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-3) |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2015-03-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2015-03-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-03-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-03-03 | House | Second consideration |
2015-03-02 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-26 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |