PA HB566 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 17, 1994 (P.L.73, No.7), known as the Contractor and Subcontractor Payment Act, further providing for application of act, for owner's payment obligations, for owner's withholding of payment for good faith claims, for contractor's and subcontractor's payment obligations, for errors in documentation, for retainage, for contractor's withholding of payment for good faith claims and for penalty and attorney fee.
Title
Further providing for application of act, for owner's payment obligations, for owner's withholding of payment for good faith claims, for contractor's and subcontractor's payment obligations, for errors in documentation, for retainage, for contractor's withholding of payment for good faith claims and for penalty and attorney fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 566 PN 3544, CONCUR (Y: 175 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 566 PN 3544, MOT POSTPONE, TOBASH (Y: 10 N: 181 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 566 PN 3544, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 566 PN 1928, FP (Y: 168 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01584 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 566 PN 3544, CONCUR (Y: 175 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 566 PN 3544, MOT POSTPONE, TOBASH (Y: 10 N: 181 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 566 PN 3544, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 566 PN 1928, FP (Y: 168 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01584 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Act No. 27 |
2018-06-12 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-04 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-04 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-05-23 | House | Signed in House |
2018-05-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (175-16) |
2018-05-23 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-05-22 | House | In the House |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (43-5) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (168-26) |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-19 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-06 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-06 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |