PA HB566 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of February 17, 1994 (P.L.73, No.7), known as the Contractor and Subcontractor Payment Act, further providing for application of act, for owner's payment obligations, for owner's withholding of payment for good faith claims, for contractor's and subcontractor's payment obligations, for errors in documentation, for retainage, for contractor's withholding of payment for good faith claims and for penalty and attorney fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for application of act, for owner's payment obligations, for owner's withholding of payment for good faith claims, for contractor's and subcontractor's payment obligations, for errors in documentation, for retainage, for contractor's withholding of payment for good faith claims and for penalty and attorney fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 566 PN 3544, CONCUR (Y: 175 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 566 PN 3544, MOT POSTPONE, TOBASH (Y: 10 N: 181 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 566 PN 3544, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 566 PN 1928, FP (Y: 168 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01584 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12HouseAct No. 27
2018-06-12HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-06-04HousePresented to the Governor
2018-06-04HouseSigned in Senate
2018-05-23HouseSigned in House
2018-05-23HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (175-16)
2018-05-23HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-05-23HouseReferred to RULES
2018-05-22HouseIn the House
2018-05-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (43-5)
2018-05-21SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-04-17SenateRemoved from table
2018-04-17SenateLaid on the table
2018-01-30SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-30SenateReported as committed
2017-07-06SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2017-06-20SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (168-26)
2017-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-19HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-06HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-06HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-06HouseReported as amended
2017-02-21HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=566
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0566&pn=0591
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0566&pn=1928
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0566&pn=3544
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=06/06/2017&RollCallId=483
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=06/06/2017&RollCallId=484
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/19/2017&RollCallId=670
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=508
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/20/2017&RollCallId=678
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=01/30/2018&RollCallId=646
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=494
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1256
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1257
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=05/23/2018&RollCallId=1546

Bill Comments

feedback