PA HB555 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a portion of State Route 562 in Berks County as the General Carl A. Spaatz Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of State Route 562 in Berks County as the General Carl A. Spaatz Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 555 PN 578, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-26SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-09-25SenateIn the Senate
2017-09-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-09-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-09-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-09-13HouseSecond consideration
2017-09-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-28HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-28HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-28HouseReported as committed
2017-02-17HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback