PA HB555 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-30 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in transportation of pupils, further providing for when transportation provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In transportation of pupils, further providing for when transportation provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-30HouseLaid on the table
2013-06-24HouseRemoved from table
2013-06-24HouseLaid on the table
2013-05-07HouseRemoved from table
2013-05-07HouseLaid on the table
2013-03-13HouseRemoved from table
2013-02-11HouseLaid on the table
2013-02-11HouseFirst consideration
2013-02-11HouseReported as amended
2013-02-06HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback