PA HB537 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in emergency COVID-19 response, establishing the County Block Grant - Small Business Grant Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In emergency COVID-19 response, establishing the County Block Grant - Small Business Grant Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A00901 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-25HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-05HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-05HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-05HouseReported as amended
2021-02-16HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback