PA HB512 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Act No. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Act No. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 11 (Cities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in corporate powers, further providing for municipal authorities and cooperation with other political subdivisions.
Title
In corporate powers, further providing for municipal authorities and cooperation with other political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 512 PN 498, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor: HB 512 PN 498, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor: HB 512 PN 498, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | Senate | Act No. 82 |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-03-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-03-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2019-03-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-20 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |