PA HB488 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in corporate powers, further providing for appropriations for hospitals and for tourist promotion agencies.
Title
In corporate powers, further providing for appropriations for hospitals and for tourist promotion agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] | Rep. RoseMarie Swanger [R] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Dick Hess [R] |
Rep. Gordon Denlinger [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - HB 488 PN 1131, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - HB 488 PN 1131, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-03-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2013-03-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-03-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-03-19 | House | Second consideration |
2013-03-18 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |