PA HB484 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-20 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-20 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Pending: Senate Public Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the Early Childhood Vision Care Education Program and for powers and duties of the Department of Health.
Title
Providing for the Early Childhood Vision Care Education Program and for powers and duties of the Department of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-17 - House - House Floor: HB 484 PN 542, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
2015-11-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-11-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2015-11-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-10 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-09 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-26 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to HEALTH |