PA HB483 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on September 25 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 57
Status: Enrolled on September 25 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 57
Summary
An Act establishing the Mine Families First Program; providing assistance to persons whose family members are trapped, injured or waiting rescue during an underground mine emergency and for duties of the Department of Environmental Protection.
Title
An Act establishing the Mine Families First Program; providing assistance to persons whose family members are trapped, injured or waiting rescue during an underground mine emergency and for duties of the Department of Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-10-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-09-25 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-09-24 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-09-24 | Signed in House | |
2007-09-19 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-09-18 | Second consideration | |
2007-09-18 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-30 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-26 | First consideration | |
2007-06-26 | Reported as committed | |
2007-06-11 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2007-06-04 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-05-23 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-05-08 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-05-08 | Second consideration | |
2007-04-30 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-25 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-25 | First consideration | |
2007-04-25 | Reported as committed | |
2007-02-26 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=483 |