PA HB464 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 19, 1990 (P.L.1234, No.204), known as the Family Caregiver Support Act, further providing for title of act, for intent, for definitions, for primary caregiver support program, for reimbursements, for entitlement not created and for enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for title of act, for intent, for definitions, for primary caregiver support program, for reimbursements, for entitlement not created and for enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 464 PN 1392, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 464 PN 1392, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 464 PN 1013, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A00421 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11HouseAct No. 20
2021-06-11HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-06-10HousePresented to the Governor
2021-06-09HouseSigned in Senate
2021-06-09HouseSigned in House
2021-06-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2021-06-09HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-06-09HouseReferred to RULES
2021-06-08HouseIn the House
2021-06-08SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-0)
2021-06-07SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-05-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-10SenateSecond consideration
2021-04-28SenateFirst consideration
2021-04-28SenateReported as amended
2021-04-09SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2021-04-06SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-04-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-05HouseSecond consideration
2021-03-24HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-23HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-23HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-23HouseReported as amended
2021-02-09HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=464
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0464&pn=0425
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0464&pn=1013
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0464&pn=1392
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0464P1013.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0464P1392.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0464P1392.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=03/23/2021&RollCallId=192
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=03/23/2021&RollCallId=193
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=129
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/06/2021&RollCallId=264
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=04/28/2021&RollCallId=152
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/07/2021&RollCallId=252
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=137
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/09/2021&RollCallId=593
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=319

Bill Comments

feedback