PA HB448 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-30 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-30 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for an Energy Star related glass or window technologies tax credit.
Title
Providing for an Energy Star related glass or window technologies tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-30 | Removed from table | |
2009-04-29 | Laid on the table | |
2009-04-29 | First consideration | |
2009-04-29 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-13 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |