PA HB447 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-28 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-28 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of Department of Labor and Industry, its departmental administrative and advisory boards and departments administrative officers, further providing for fair share fee and payroll deduction.
Title
In powers and duties of Department of Labor and Industry, its departmental administrative and advisory boards and departments administrative officers, further providing for fair share fee and payroll deduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Labor And Industry: To Table (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - House - House Labor And Industry: To Table (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |