PA HB434 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-7)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Act No. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-7)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Act No. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for definitions, for establishment of Statewide database, for disposition of founded and indicated reports, for expunction of information of perpetrator under the age of 18, for amendment or expunction of information, for information relating to prospective child-care personnel, for information relating to family day-care home residents, for information relating to other persons having contact with children, for cooperation of other agencies and for reports to Governor and General Assembly; repealing provisions relating to students in public and private schools and for background checks for employment in schools; and making a related repeal.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for definitions, for establishment of Statewide database, for disposition of founded and indicated reports, for expunction of information of perpetrator under the age of 18, for amendment or expunction of information, for information relating to prospective child-care personnel, for information relating to family day-care home residents, for information relating to other persons having contact with children, for cooperation of other agencies and for reports to Governor and General Assembly; repealing provisions relating to students in public and private schools and for background checks for employment in schools; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - HB 434 PN 2009, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - House - HB 434 PN 2009, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | House | Act No. 45 |
2014-05-14 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-05-08 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | Signed in House |
2014-05-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0) |
2014-05-06 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-04-30 | House | In the House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2013-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2013-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-19 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |