PA HB431 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for education and training.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for education and training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-03 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - HB 431 PN 1515, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 431 PN 1428, 2013 A806, ROZZI (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - HB 431 PN 1515, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - HB 431 PN 1428, 2013 A806, ROZZI (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Act No. 31 |
2014-04-15 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-04-08 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-04-07 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-04-02 | House | Signed in House |
2014-04-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (199-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-04-01 | House | In the House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2013-04-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2013-04-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-04-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-04-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-04-10 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-09 | House | First consideration |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |