PA HB425 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on November 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Act No. 81
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for sales by liquor licensees and restrictions and for prepared beverages and mixed drinks for off-premises consumption during disaster emergency and providing for safekeeping.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for sales by liquor licensees and restrictions and for prepared beverages and mixed drinks for off-premises consumption during disaster emergency and providing for safekeeping.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-27 - House - House Floor: HB 425 PN 2314, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 425 PN 2314, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 425 PN 938, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00405 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-05HouseAct No. 81
2021-11-05HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-10-28HousePresented to the Governor
2021-10-27HouseSigned in Senate
2021-10-27HouseSigned in House
2021-10-27HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (199-0)
2021-10-27HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-10-27HouseReferred to RULES
2021-10-26HouseIn the House
2021-10-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2021-10-26SenateAmended on third consideration
2021-10-26SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-05-11SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-11SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-04-27SenateFirst consideration
2021-04-27SenateReported as amended
2021-04-14SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2021-04-05SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-04-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-24HouseSecond consideration
2021-03-23HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-16HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-16HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-16HouseReported as amended
2021-02-08HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=425
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0425&pn=0402
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0425&pn=0938
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0425&pn=1371
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0425&pn=1495
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0425&pn=2314
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0425P0938.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB0425P1495.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0425P2314.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=145
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=143
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=116
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/05/2021&RollCallId=259
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=04/27/2021&RollCallId=142
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=331
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/27/2021&RollCallId=997
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=563

Bill Comments

feedback