PA HB422 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 24, 1931 (P.L.1206, No.331), known as The First Class Township Code, in election of officers and vacancies in office, further providing for electors only eligible and for vacancies in general.
Title
In election of officers and vacancies in office, further providing for electors only eligible and for vacancies in general.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Gabler [R] | Rep. Harold English [R] | Rep. Mark Gillen [R] | Rep. Rich Irvin [R] |
Rep. Mark Longietti [D] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R] | Rep. Nicholas Miccarelli [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 422 PN 1058, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 422 PN 1058, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00519 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 422 PN 1058, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00519 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Act No. 23 |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-07-09 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-07-09 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-04-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-04 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-03 | House | Removed from table |
2017-03-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-22 | House | First consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |