PA HB415 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in inheritance tax, further providing for definitions and for inheritance tax.
Title
In inheritance tax, further providing for definitions and for inheritance tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A06160 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A06160 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-19 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-17 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to FINANCE |