PA HB415 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in inheritance tax, further providing for definitions and for inheritance tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In inheritance tax, further providing for definitions and for inheritance tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A06160 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-19HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-17HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-17HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-17HouseReported as amended
2017-02-08HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback