PA HB408 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Department of Military Affairs, providing for burial benefits.
Title
In Department of Military Affairs, providing for burial benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 408 PN 3135, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 408 PN 3050, 2019 A4457, SAINATO (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04318 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 408 PN 3135, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 408 PN 3050, 2019 A4457, SAINATO (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04318 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-01-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2020-01-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-14 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-01-13 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-17 | House | First consideration |
2019-12-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |