PA HB374 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Act No. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Act No. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 27 (Environmental Resources) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for Keystone Tree Restricted Account; and, in registration of vehicles, providing for contributions to the Keystone Tree Restricted Account.
Title
Providing for Keystone Tree Restricted Account; and, in registration of vehicles, providing for contributions to the Keystone Tree Restricted Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 374 PN 2062, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 374 PN 2062, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 374 PN 347, 2019 A1161, EVERETT (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 374 PN 347, 2019 A782, KEEFER (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 374 PN 2062, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 374 PN 347, 2019 A1161, EVERETT (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 374 PN 347, 2019 A782, KEEFER (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | Senate | Act No. 78 |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2019-06-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-10 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-16 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-02-20 | House | Removed from table |
2019-02-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-02-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-02-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |