PA HB374 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 27 (Environmental Resources) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for Keystone Tree Restricted Account; and, in registration of vehicles, providing for contributions to the Keystone Tree Fund Restricted Account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for Keystone Tree Restricted Account; and, in registration of vehicles, providing for contributions to the Keystone Tree Fund Restricted Account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 374 PN 2062, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 374 PN 347, 2019 A1161, EVERETT (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 374 PN 347, 2019 A782, KEEFER (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
2019-06-11SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2019-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-10HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2019-06-05HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-16HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-20HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-19HouseReported as committed
2019-02-05HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=374
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0374&pn=0347
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0374&pn=2062
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/19/2019&RollCallId=57
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=370
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=371
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=395
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=712

Bill Comments

feedback