PA HB367 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-08 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-08 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in bonds and recognizances, amending provisions relating to professional bondsmen; and providing for authorization to conduct business within each county, for forfeited undertaking, for private cause of action and for third party sureties.
Title
In bonds and recognizances, amending provisions relating to professional bondsmen; and providing for authorization to conduct business within each county, for forfeited undertaking, for private cause of action and for third party sureties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 367 PN 1186, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00571 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00571 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 367 PN 1186, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00571 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00571 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2015-05-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2015-05-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-22 | House | Second consideration |
2015-04-21 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-14 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |