PA HB349 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Act No. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Act No. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge located over Washington's Landing and the Allegheny River, commonly known as the 31st Street Bridge, in the City of Pittsburgh, Allegheny County, as the William Raymond Prom Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge located over Washington's Landing and the Allegheny River, commonly known as the 31st Street Bridge, in the City of Pittsburgh, Allegheny County, as the William Raymond Prom Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Rep. Dominic Costa [D] | Rep. Adam Ravenstahl [D] | Rep. Harold English [R] | Rep. Richard Saccone [R] |
Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - HB 349 PN 356, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - HB 349 PN 356, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - HB 349 PN 356, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | Act No. 11 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-05-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2013-04-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-04-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-04-10 | House | Second consideration |
2013-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |