PA HB32 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-15)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-03-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on January 30 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-03-21 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the offense of phishing.
Title
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the offense of phishing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-03-21 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-03-20 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-03-19 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-03-19 | Removed from table | |
2007-03-19 | Laid on the table | |
2007-03-19 | First consideration | |
2007-03-19 | Reported as amended | |
2007-01-30 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=32 |