PA HB301 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking, further providing for penalties.
Title
In hunting and furtaking, further providing for penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 301 PN 404, FP (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 301 PN 404, FP (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2019-09-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-09-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (185-0) |
2019-09-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-01 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |