PA HB290 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on December 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-21 - Act No. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 6, 1989 (P.L.169, No.32), known as the Storage Tank and Spill Prevention Act, in financial provisions, further providing for Underground Storage Tank Indemnification Board, for Underground Storage Tank Environmental Cleanup Program, for Underground Storage Tank Pollution Prevention Program and for investigation and closure costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In financial provisions, further providing for Underground Storage Tank Indemnification Board, for Underground Storage Tank Environmental Cleanup Program, for Underground Storage Tank Pollution Prevention Program and for investigation and closure costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-06 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: HB 290 PN 2217, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 290 PN 2217, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 290 PN 1478, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A00754 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-21HouseAct No. 61
2017-12-21HouseApproved by the Governor
2017-12-11HousePresented to the Governor
2017-12-11HouseSigned in Senate
2017-12-06HouseSigned in House
2017-12-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (187-0)
2017-12-06HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2017-07-10HouseReferred to RULES
2017-07-09HouseIn the House
2017-07-09SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-07-08SenateAmended on third consideration
2017-06-26SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-06-20SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-20SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-06-19SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-19SenateReported as amended
2017-05-04SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
2017-04-26SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-04-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-04-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-25HouseSecond consideration
2017-04-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-19HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-19HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-19HouseReported as amended
2017-02-06HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 339
2017-02-02HouseReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=290
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=0284
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=0339
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=1478
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=2068
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=2087
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0290&pn=2217
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=04/19/2017&RollCallId=255
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=8&theDate=04/19/2017&RollCallId=253
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=298
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/26/2017&RollCallId=317
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=9&theDate=06/19/2017&RollCallId=289
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/26/2017&RollCallId=346
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=226
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=891
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=12/06/2017&RollCallId=1108

Bill Comments

feedback