PA HB2861 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-26 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-26 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for access to long-term care facilities for essential caregivers, for additional safety requirements for residents of long-term care facilities, for suspension of access for essential caregivers and for personal protective equipment for essential caregivers.
Title
Providing for access to long-term care facilities for essential caregivers, for additional safety requirements for residents of long-term care facilities, for suspension of access for essential caregivers and for personal protective equipment for essential caregivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2861 PN 4564, FP (Y: 176 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2861 PN 4383, 2019 A7435, RAPP (Y: 130 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A07189 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2861 PN 4564, FP (Y: 176 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2861 PN 4383, 2019 A7435, RAPP (Y: 130 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A07189 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2020-10-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-10-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (176-26) |
2020-10-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-09-30 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-16 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-09-14 | House | Referred to HEALTH |