PA HB283 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of February 14, 2008 (P.L.6, No.3), known as the Right-to-Know Law, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in procedure, further providing for written requests; and, in judicial review, further providing for fee limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in procedure, further providing for written requests; and, in judicial review, further providing for fee limitations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 283 PN 3150, FP (Y: 177 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Floor: HB 283 PN 1736, 2019 A3202, SIMMONS (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A01181 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-01-21SenateIn the Senate
2020-01-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (177-15)
2020-01-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-01-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-01-15HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-01-14HouseRemoved from table
2020-01-14HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-23HouseRemoved from table
2019-06-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-18HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-06HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-06HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-06HouseReported as amended
2019-01-30HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=283
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0283&pn=0256
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0283&pn=1736
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0283&pn=3150
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=437
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=448
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1054
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1063
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/21/2020&RollCallId=1646

Bill Comments

feedback