PA HB2724 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-26 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-26 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 2, 1966 (1965 P.L.1860, No.586), entitled "An act encouraging landowners to make land and water areas available to the public for recreational purposes by limiting liability in connection therewith, and repealing certain acts," further providing for definitions; and providing for recreational user's claim for property rights and for the substitution of the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources for a party in litigation.
Title
Amending the act of February 2, 1966 (1965 P.L.1860, No.586), entitled "An act encouraging landowners to make land and water areas available to the public for recreational purposes by limiting liability in connection therewith, and repealing certain acts," further providing for definitions; and providing for recreational user's claim for property rights and for the substitution of the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources for a party in litigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2724 PN 4197, FP (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 2724 PN 4197, FP (Y: 109 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2020-10-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-10-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (109-93) |
2020-10-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-30 | House | Second consideration |
2020-09-29 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-02 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-09-02 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-02 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-08-06 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |