PA HB2667 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 142 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 142 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 7 (Banks and Banking) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2667 PN 3226, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2667 PN 3226, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 2667 PN 3226, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 142 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2022-06-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-28 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-13 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |