PA HB2649 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-23 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-23 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for composition of commission, membership, compensation, vacancies and removal and for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations.
Title
Further providing for composition of commission, membership, compensation, vacancies and removal and for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations.
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Martin Causer [R] | Rep. Barbara Gleim [R] |
Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] | Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. Jesse Topper [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Brian Smith [R] | Rep. Torren Ecker [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] |
Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R] | Rep. Joe Hamm [R] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
Rep. Ryan Warner [R] | Rep. Kathy Rapp [R] | Rep. David Rowe [R] | Rep. Mike Armanini [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2649 PN 3203, FP (Y: 110 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2649 PN 3203, 2021 A4809 (Y: 89 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2649 PN 3203, FP (Y: 110 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 2649 PN 3203, 2021 A4809 (Y: 89 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |
2022-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (110-89) |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3203 |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |