PA HB2646 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-21 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in certification of teachers, providing for out-of-State applicants for career and technical education certification.
Title
In certification of teachers, providing for out-of-State applicants for career and technical education certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2646 PN 3229, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A04542 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 2646 PN 3229, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A04542 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2022-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-15 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-13 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-13 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-06-02 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |