PA HB261 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on February 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-04 - Act No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on February 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-04 - Act No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," further providing for civil penalties.
Title
Amending the act of July 2, 1993 (P.L.345, No.48), entitled "An act empowering the General Counsel or his designee to issue subpoenas for certain licensing board activities; providing for hearing examiners in the Bureau of Professional and Occupational Affairs; providing additional powers to the Commissioner of Professional and Occupational Affairs; and further providing for civil penalties and license suspension," further providing for civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - HB 261 PN 273, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-11-12 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - HB 261 PN 273, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | Act No. 6 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-11-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2013-05-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-05-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2013-05-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-05-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-05-06 | House | Second consideration |
2013-04-24 | House | Removed from table |
2013-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |