PA HB2586 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 138 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 138 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 38 (Holidays and Observances) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in veteran recognition, providing for Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day.
Title
In veteran recognition, providing for Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2586 PN 3100, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2586 PN 3100, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2586 PN 3100, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 138 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2022-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |