PA HB2585 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-07 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-07 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in comprehensive health care for uninsured children, further providing for contracts and coverage packages.
Title
In comprehensive health care for uninsured children, further providing for contracts and coverage packages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2585 PN 3098, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 2585 PN 3098, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2022-06-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-05-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-05-25 | House | Second consideration |
2022-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-05-06 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |