PA HB257 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-03 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-03 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for acquisition of buildings, sites for school buildings and playgrounds, and disposing thereof, for approval by department of plans, etc., of buildings and exceptions and for approval of lease agreements.
Title
Further providing for acquisition of buildings, sites for school buildings and playgrounds, and disposing thereof, for approval by department of plans, etc., of buildings and exceptions and for approval of lease agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - House - HB 257 PN 1447, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2011-05-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-05-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2011-05-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-02 | House | Second consideration |
2011-04-27 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-06 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-01-26 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |