PA HB2556 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-12 - Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4212
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for definitions and for exclusions from tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sales and use tax, further providing for definitions and for exclusions from tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-09 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A09945 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-12HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4212
2018-10-09HouseLaid on the table
2018-10-09HouseFirst consideration
2018-10-09HouseReported as amended
2018-07-10HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2556
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2556&pn=3862
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2556&pn=4193
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2556&pn=4212
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2001
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2002

Bill Comments

feedback