PA HB2556 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1947 (P.L.1368, No.542), known as the Real Estate Tax Sale Law, providing for additional costs for rehabilitation and maintenance.
Title
Providing for additional costs for rehabilitation and maintenance.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Richard Grucela [D] | Rep. David Kessler [D] |
Rep. Chris Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-14 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-14 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-13 | Laid on the table | |
2010-09-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-09 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2010-06-09 | First consideration | |
2010-06-09 | Reported as committed | |
2010-06-01 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |