PA HB2526 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 78 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 78 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of December 8, 1982 (P.L.848, No.235), entitled "An act providing for the adoption of capital projects related to the repair, rehabilitation or replacement of highway bridges to be financed from current revenue or by the incurring of debt and capital projects related to highway and safety improvement projects to be financed from current revenue of the Motor License Fund," itemizing additional State and local bridge projects.
Title
A Supplement to the act of December 8, 1982 (P.L.848, No.235), entitled "An act providing for the adoption of capital projects related to the repair, rehabilitation or replacement of highway bridges to be financed from current revenue or by the incurring of debt and capital projects related to highway and safety improvement projects to be financed from current revenue of the Motor License Fund," itemizing additional State and local bridge projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2526 PN 3206, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05179 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2526 PN 3206, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2526 PN 3003, 2021 A4347 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2526 PN 3003, 2021 A4222 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05179 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 2526 PN 3206, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2526 PN 3003, 2021 A4347 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 2526 PN 3003, 2021 A4222 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | Senate | Act No. 78 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-08 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Motion to revert to Prior Printer's No. 3206 |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-08 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-26 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |