PA HB2507 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-07 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Pennsylvania Military Community Enhancement Commission; and providing for its powers and duties.
Title
Establishing the Pennsylvania Military Community Enhancement Commission; and providing for its powers and duties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-07 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2014-10-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2014-10-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-24 | House | Second consideration |
2014-09-23 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-22 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2014-09-19 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |