PA HB2496 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Title
Providing for emergency COVID-19 provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-20 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-18 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-05-12 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |