PA HB2458 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 4 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 36A
Status: Enrolled on July 4 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 36A
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the restricted revenue accounts within the State Gaming Fund and from the State Gaming Fund to the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, the Department of Revenue, the Pennsylvania State Police and the Attorney General for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2008, to June 30, 2009, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2008.
Title
An Act making appropriations from the restricted revenue accounts within the State Gaming Fund and from the State Gaming Fund to the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, the Department of Revenue, the Pennsylvania State Police and the Attorney General for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2008, to June 30, 2009, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2008.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-07-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2008-07-04 | Presented to the Governor | |
2008-07-03 | Signed in Senate | |
2008-07-03 | Signed in House | |
2008-07-03 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2008-07-03 | Reported as committed | |
2008-07-03 | Referred to RULES | |
2008-07-03 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-07-02 | Re-reported as amended | |
2008-07-01 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-07-01 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-30 | First consideration | |
2008-06-30 | Reported as committed | |
2008-06-29 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-25 | Final passage | |
2008-06-25 | Third consideration, with amendments | |
2008-06-24 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2008-06-03 | Removed from table | |
2008-06-02 | Laid on the table | |
2008-06-02 | First consideration | |
2008-06-02 | Reported as committed | |
2008-04-15 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2458 |